+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 26, 2014 in the House:
- Act No. 264
On June 13, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date 06/06/14
On June 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On June 5, 2014 in the House:
- Ratified R 284
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0
- Concurred in House amendment and enrolled
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Banking and Insurance
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (3)
May 29, 2014: To concur
- Yeas: 44
- Present/NV: 2
May 21, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 20
- Absent: 5
March 19, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor