+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 17, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 271
On June 16, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date 06/09/16
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Ratified R 295
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled for ratification
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- House recedes from amendment
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Non-concurrence in House amendment
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-1
- Read second time
- Amended
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed., 6-1-16
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-1
- Read third time and sent to House
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Gregory , Malloy, Turner
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2016: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 100
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 17
- Absent: 4
April 26, 2016: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor