+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Introduced
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Adopted, sent to House
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recalled from Committee on Transportation
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced
On December 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor