+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Introduced
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Adopted, sent to House
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recalled from Committee on Transportation
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced