+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Adopted, sent to Senate
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Introduced
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Adopted, sent to House
- Recalled from Committee on Transportation
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced