+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
- Recalled from Committee on Transportation
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Adopted, sent to Senate
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor