+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recalled from Committee on Transportation
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Adopted, sent to Senate
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor