+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Adopted, sent to Senate
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Introduced
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Adopted, sent to House
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Transportation
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor