+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recalled from Committee on Transportation
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Adopted, sent to Senate
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Jefferson, S.Williams, Rivers
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Introduced
On December 18, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Prefiled