+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Introduced
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Adopted, sent to House
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Transportation
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor