+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Adopted, sent to Senate
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Introduced
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Adopted, sent to House
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Transportation
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor