+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-1
- Read second time
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed to Committee on Finance
- Recalled from Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
February 20, 2018: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor