+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Act No. 2
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date 03/01/13
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified R 2
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-97 Nays-8
- Read second time
- Requests for debate-Rep. Tallon, Sellers, Brannon, Cole, Pope, Hamilton, Clemmons, Quinn, Simrill, Hixon, Bedingfield, Hardwick, Loftis, Hiott, Ott, JR Smith, Taylor, Clyburn, Hosey, Forrester, King, Neal, Sabb, Parks, Pitts, GR Smith, Goldfinch
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-22 Nays-15
- Read second time
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Fish, Game and Forestry
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
- Introduced and read first time
On December 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (3)
February 20, 2013: Table Motion to Adjourn Debate
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 34
- Present/NV: 25
- Absent: 2
February 20, 2013: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 16
- Absent: 2
January 22, 2013: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor