+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
- Read second time
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
March 1, 2018: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 2