+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 12, 2014 in the House:
- Act No. 215
On June 11, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date 06/02/14
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Ratified R 222
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Recalled from Committee on Ways and Means
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Recalled from Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-3
- Read second time
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Finance
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Introduced and read first time
On December 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (2)
May 28, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 20
- Absent: 6
March 5, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor