+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 2, 2021 in the House:
- Act No. 109
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Effective date 05/19/21
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Ratified R 79
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0
- Read second time
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Kershaw Delegation
- Introduced and read first time
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar
+ − Vote
May 6, 2021: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 103
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor