+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 12, 2021 in the House:
- Act No. 93
- Effective date 6/24/21
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On June 21, 2021 in the House:
- Ratified R 114
- Read third time and enrolled
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-97 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Delegation report: Favorable York Delegation
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to York Delegation
- Introduced and read first time
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recalled from Committee on Judiciary
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
June 9, 2021: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 21
- Absent: 6
April 7, 2021: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor