+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 203
- Effective date 06/03/16
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Ratified R 221
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-0
- Concurred in House amendment and enrolled
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-111 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (3)
May 24, 2016: To concur
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 4
May 17, 2016: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 2
May 28, 2015: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor