+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Act No. 59
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Effective date 5/19/17
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Ratified R 92
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-83 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recalled from Committee on Judiciary
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
May 10, 2017: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 83
- Present/NV: 34
- Absent: 3
May 4, 2017: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 2