+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
- Read second time
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
February 6, 2018: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1