+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 12, 2020 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-13-20
On April 8, 2020 in the House:
- Debate adjourned
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time