+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-92 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Member request name added as sponsor: Mitchell, Gilliard, Williams
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
April 14, 2016: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 26
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor