+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-28 Nays-67
- Rejected
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-30-14
- Member request name added as sponsor: Gilliard, Whipper, R.L.Brown, Mack, Anderson
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Recalled from Committee on Education and Public Works
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
April 30, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 67
- Present/NV: 25
- Absent: 4