+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (36)
On July 12, 2018 in the House:
- Act No. 260
On July 5, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date 07/02/18
On July 2, 2018 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On June 28, 2018 in the House:
- Ratified R 289
On June 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled for ratification
- Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-2
- Conference report received and adopted
On June 27, 2018 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-108 Nays-0
- Conference report received and adopted
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to Senate with amendments
- Senate amendment amended
- Conference committee appointed Taylor, Elliott, Alexander
- Roll call Yeas-83 Nays-14
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Non-concurrence in House amendment
- Conference committee appointed Turner, Young, Allen
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-5
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
- Amended
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced and read first time
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Blackwell
- Amended
- Read second time
- Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Stringer, West, Allison, Henderson, G.R.Smith, Burns, Trantham, Hamilton, Bannister, Putnam, Robinson-Simpson, Chumley, Taylor, Douglas, Knight, Dillard
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Committed to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Recalled from Committee on Ways and Means
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (5)
June 27, 2018: To adopt the conference report
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
June 27, 2018: Adopt Conference Report
- Yeas: 108
- Present/NV: 12
- Absent: 4
May 10, 2018: Adopt Amendment number 1a
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 20
- Absent: 7
May 9, 2018: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 3
March 8, 2018: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 103
- Present/NV: 13
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor