+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Fish, Game and Forestry
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
- Introduced and read first time
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-89 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
- Member request name added as sponsor: J.E.Smith
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
March 2, 2016: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 89
- Present/NV: 29
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor