+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Act No. 150
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date 04/04/18
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Ratified R 158
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and enrolled
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recalled from Committee on Judiciary
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-77 Nays-0
- Read second time
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
+ − Votes (2)
March 22, 2018: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 5
February 8, 2018: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 45
- Absent: 1