+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 16, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 258
On June 15, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date 06/05/16
On June 5, 2016 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Ratified R 220
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-76 Nays-29
- Read second time
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. Hayes, Hills, White, Anthony, Felder, Norman, Clary, Hamilton, Hart, McEachern
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-3
- Read second time
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (3)
May 31, 2016: Table Amendment number 1
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 35
- Present/NV: 19
- Absent: 4
May 31, 2016: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 13
- Absent: 4
May 21, 2015: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1