+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services
- Introduced and read first time
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-6
- Read second time
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On December 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Prefiled
+ − Vote
March 3, 2020: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 106
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 2