+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 16, 2014 in the House:
- Act No. 242
On June 13, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date 07/01/14
On June 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On June 5, 2014 in the House:
- Ratified R 271
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Concurred in House amendment and enrolled
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Thur., 5-29-14
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-5
- Read second time
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Finance
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
May 29, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 106
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 8
June 4, 2013: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor