+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 31, 2018 in the House:
- Act No. 250
On May 30, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date 05/18/18
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Ratified R 261
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-93 Nays-0
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-1
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Massey , McElveen, Senn
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-114 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Recalled from Committee on Judiciary
- Member request name added as sponsor: Brawley, Weeks
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (3)
May 2, 2018: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 27
- Absent: 3
April 26, 2018: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 1
January 30, 2018: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 114
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 1