+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Act No. 170
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date 05/03/18
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Ratified R 183
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and enrolled
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
- Read second time
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Amended
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Read second time
- Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-1
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
- Member request name added as sponsor: Hewitt, Blackwell, Forrest, Hixon
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: W.Newton
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Kirby, Henderson-Myers, Martin, Burns, Williams, Yow
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Anthony, Atkinson
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
April 25, 2018: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
March 8, 2018: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 18
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor