+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-61 Nays-44
- Rejected
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-64 Nays-33
- Read second time
- Amended
- Member request name added as sponsor: Loftis, Rivers, Cobb-Hunter, King
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Thur., 4-5-18
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Gilliard, Funderburk
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Bernstein, Knight
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Caskey
- Requests for debate-Rep. JE Smith, McCoy, Sandifer, Forrester, Crosby, Murphy, Weeks, Douglas, Bernstein, Williams, Jefferson, McCravy, Fry, Atwater, Ballentine, Henegan, Toole, Bryant, VS Moss, Dilliard, Crawford, B Newton
- Scrivener's error corrected
- Member request name added as sponsor: Norrell
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
- Member request name removed as sponsor: Bennett, Huggins
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Stavrinakis
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Clary, Bennett, Arrington
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On November 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (10)
April 10, 2018: Table motion to resolve into committee of the whole
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 51
- Present/NV: 11
- Absent: 7
April 10, 2018: Table motion to reconsider Committee of Whole
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 54
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 7
April 10, 2018: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 44
- Present/NV: 11
- Absent: 7
April 5, 2018: Table Amendment number 4
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 20
- Absent: 10
April 5, 2018: Table Amendment number 7
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 47
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 11
April 5, 2018: Table motion to commit
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 45
- Present/NV: 16
- Absent: 9
April 5, 2018: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 33
- Present/NV: 15
- Absent: 11
April 5, 2018: Continue
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 65
- Present/NV: 12
- Absent: 11
April 5, 2018: Adopt Amendment number 1
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 17
- Absent: 9
April 5, 2018: Table Amendment number 3
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 15
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor