+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Act No. 50
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date See Act for Effective Date
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Ratified R 70
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Concurred in House amendment and enrolled
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
May 8, 2019: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 103
- Present/NV: 13
- Absent: 7
March 14, 2019: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor