+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On October 16, 2018 in the House:
- Act No. 281
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date 03/12/18
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Ratified R 147
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
- Amended
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-96 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Recalled from Orangeburg Delegation
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Orangeburg Delegation
- Introduced and read first time
On November 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Orangeburg Delegation
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (2)
February 15, 2018: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 18
- Absent: 4
January 30, 2018: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 26
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor