+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Act No. 46
- Effective date 06/07/13
On June 7, 2013 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified R 54
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-112 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Finance
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
May 21, 2013: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 112
- Present/NV: 12
April 9, 2013: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor