+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Act No. 52
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date 06/03/15
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified R 83
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Concurred in House amendment and enrolled
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Recalled from Committee on Education and Public Works
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amended
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
May 27, 2015: Adoption of Bill
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 19
- Absent: 4
March 26, 2015: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor