+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. Spires, Hill, Calhoon, Kirby, Allison, Long, Burns, Tallon, Hyde, Hiott, DC Moss, Forrest, Hewitt, Jones. Thayer, West, Sandifer, Whitmire, Ott
- Member request name added as sponsor: Magnuson
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Thur., 2-27-20
- Member request name added as sponsor: Clemmons, McGinnis, Jefferson, R.Williams
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: B.Newton
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor