+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (12)
+ − Actions (41)
On July 9, 2014 in the House:
- Act No. 294
On July 8, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date 06/23/14
On June 23, 2014 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On June 20, 2014 in the House:
- Ratified R 328
On June 19, 2014 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled for ratification
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-2
- Free conference report adopted
- Free conference committee appointed Cleary, Davis, Johnson
- Free conference powers granted
On June 17, 2014 in the House:
- Free conference powers granted
- Free conference report received and adopted
- Free conference committee appointed Horne, Cobb-Hunter, Newton
- Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0
On June 16, 2014 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On June 5, 2014 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed Horne, Cobb-Hunter, Newton
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Cleary, Davis, Johnson
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-0 Nays-104
- Non-concurrence in Senate amendment
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Read second time
- Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-4
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Amended
- Read second time
- Roll call Yeas-95 Nays-0
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: R.L.Brown, Goldfinch
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On December 4, 2013 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On December 3, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (6)
June 19, 2014: To adopt the Free Conference report
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
June 17, 2014: Granting Free Conference Powers
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 21
- Absent: 3
June 17, 2014: Adopt Free Conference Report
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 21
- Absent: 3
June 4, 2014: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Nays: 104
- Present/NV: 16
- Absent: 4
May 29, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 4
April 10, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 26
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor