+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amended
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Amended
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Amended
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Young , McElveen, Shealy, Turner
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced and read first time
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Thur., 3-17-16
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Weeks
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
March 17, 2016: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 17
- Absent: 7