+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-84 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
- Member request name added as sponsor: Jefferson
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Tues., 2-2-16
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Thur., 1-14-16
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
+ − Vote
February 2, 2016: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 84
- Present/NV: 34
- Absent: 6