+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Act No. 175
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date 05/16/14
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Ratified R 192
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-0
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
- Read second time
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Young , Shealy, Kimpson
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0
- Read second time
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Requests for debate removed-Rep. Gilliard, Sabb
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. Cobb-Hunter, Howard, Neal, Sabb, Mitchell, Gilliard, Govan
- Reconsidered
- Debate adjourned until Thur., 6-613
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
+ − Votes (3)
April 30, 2014: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 19
- Absent: 6
April 16, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 4
January 15, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 19
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor