+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Talley , Campsen, Sabb, Reichenbach, Tedder
On May 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On May 4, 2023 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-0
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On May 3, 2023 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On May 2, 2023 in the House:
- Debate adjourned
- Member request name added as sponsor: Jefferson
On April 27, 2023 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: W.Newton, Jordan, Pope, Bannister, J.E.Johnson, Brittain, Elliott
On April 26, 2023 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. McCravy, Harris, Magnuson, Cromer, Chumley, Burns, May. McCabe, Trantham, Vaughan, TA Morgan, Elliott, Bernstein, Jordan, White, Gilliard, Kirby, Hosey, Beach
On April 19, 2023 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On March 1, 2023 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Gilliard, Wheeler, Wetmore, King, Howard, Henegan, Stavrinakis, Bauer, Rutherford
On February 28, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
May 4, 2023: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 22
- Absent: 4
May 3, 2023: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 105
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor