+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced and read first time
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-95 Nays-1
- Read second time
- Amended
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. Je Smith, Southard, Jefferson, Williams, King, Ott, Putnam, Thayer, Whitmire, Sandifer, White, Govan, Neal, Patrick, Knight, Cobb-Hunter, Douglas, Hiott, Hosey, Clyburn, Anderson, Wood, Gilliard, Owens, Taylor, JR Smith, Robbinson-Simpson,Dilliard, Huggins, Ballentine, Hixon, Norrell, Anthony
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-2-14
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (3)
April 10, 2014: Table Amendment number 2
- Yeas: 1
- Nays: 97
- Present/NV: 19
- Absent: 7
April 10, 2014: Table Amendment number 3
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 17
- Absent: 7
April 10, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 21
- Absent: 7