+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Act No. 88
On June 20, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date 06/13/13
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified R 110
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and enrolled
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
- Introduced and read first time
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
June 4, 2013: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Present/NV: 2
April 30, 2013: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 106
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor