+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 12, 2014 in the House:
- Act No. 225
On June 11, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date 06/02/14
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Ratified R 254
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Hembree , Massey, McElveen
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-0
- Read second time
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 2
April 29, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 106
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor