+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Act No. 70
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date 05/16/19
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Ratified R 90
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Concurred in House amendment and enrolled
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to Senate with amendments
- Senate amendment amended
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
- Amended
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recalled from Committee on Judiciary
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto , Shealy, Young, McLeod, Senn
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
- Roll call Yeas-89 Nays-9
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced and read first time
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-2
- Read second time
- Amended
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Reconsidered
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-1
- Read second time
- Amended
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed., 3-27-19
- Member request name added as sponsor: Jefferson, R.Williams
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: B.Newton
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Gagnon, Thayer, McCravy
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Martin
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (6)
May 8, 2019: Adopt Amendment number 1a
- Yeas: 106
- Present/NV: 11
- Absent: 6
April 23, 2019: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 1
April 3, 2019: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 20
- Absent: 4
April 2, 2019: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 105
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 11
- Absent: 4
March 27, 2019: Table Amendment number 2
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 42
- Present/NV: 12
- Absent: 7
March 27, 2019: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 100
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 17
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor