+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Member request name added as sponsor: W.Newton
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
March 10, 2022: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 105
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 6