+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced and read first time
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
April 6, 2017: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 16
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor