+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Act No. 139
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date 03/12/18
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Ratified R 144
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-95 Nays-0
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-1
- Read second time
- Amended
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Debate interrupted
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Debate interrupted
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Special order, set for February 20, 2018
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-4
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture and Natural Resources
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
- Introduced and read first time
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-77 Nays-12
- Read second time
- Amended
- Member request name added as sponsor: Magnuson, Long, Chumley, Burns, Loftis, Gagnon
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: S.Rivers
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. Hiott, B Newton, Clary, Forrester, Toole, Hixon, Cogswell, Burns, GR Smith, Brown, Martin, Elliott, JE Smith, Weeks, Anderson, Davis, Cobb-Hunter, Kirby, Jefferson, Williams, Hill, West, Ballentine, Spires, King, Huggins, Hewitt, Fry, Hardee, Erickson, W Newton, Wheeler, Hart, Norrell, Murphy, Chumley
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name removed as sponsor: Toole
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (16)
March 1, 2018: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 103
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 6
February 27, 2018: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
February 20, 2018: To set for Special Order
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 9, 2017: Table Amendment number 2
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 22
- Absent: 2
May 9, 2017: Table Amendment number 3
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 25
- Absent: 1
May 9, 2017: Table Amendment number 4
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 34
- Absent: 1
May 9, 2017: Table Amendment number 6
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 32
- Absent: 1
May 9, 2017: Table Amendment number 7
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 40
- Absent: 1
May 9, 2017: Table the Motion to Adjourn Debate
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 27
- Absent: 2
May 9, 2017: Table Amendment number 11
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 40
- Absent: 2
May 9, 2017: Table Amendment number 13
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 47
- Absent: 4
May 9, 2017: Table Amendment number 16
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 46
- Absent: 4
May 9, 2017: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 27
- Absent: 4
May 9, 2017: Adjourn For The Day
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 62
- Present/NV: 34
- Absent: 1
May 9, 2017: Cloture
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 44
- Present/NV: 20
- Absent: 2
May 9, 2017: Adjourn For The Day
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 56
- Present/NV: 20
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor