+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 31, 2018 in the House:
- Act No. 246
On May 30, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date 07/01/18
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Ratified R 246
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
- Concurred in House amendment and enrolled
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0
- Returned to the Senate
- Senate amendment amended
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment Adopted
- Read second time
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Introduced and read first time
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (4)
May 10, 2018: To concur
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 4
May 2, 2018: Adopt Amendment number 1
- Yeas: 105
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 4
April 26, 2018: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
April 4, 2017: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 103
- Present/NV: 12
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor